+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685).
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715).
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 13-16).
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 13-16) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kim, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-16 2:30PM in conference room 325.
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656).
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Kim, Shimabukuro.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Hashem, San Buenaventura, McDermott.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 392).
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Slom, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House.
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 410) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-16.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3305) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-16 9:05AM in conference room 016.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 187).
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, Saiki, Tupola excused (3).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 712-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-04-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-16 2:00PM in room 325.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-28-16 2:01PM in House conference room 325.
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor