+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL/WAM.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3138) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL/WAM.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere, Green, Harimoto, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-23-16 11:00AM in conference room 224.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-16 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HMS, JDL/WAM.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 186).
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Lowen voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 921-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 11:02AM in House conference room 308.
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har, Jordan, McDermott, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 487-16), recommending referral to FIN.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Brower.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-11-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Jordan, McDermott voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 21-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Creagan, Hashem, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-02-16 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor