+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 521) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
On February 10, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-10-23 10:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 3
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor