+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with Representative(s) Har, Jordan, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Creagan, San Buenaventura, Say excused (3).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 69-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Cullen, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Evans, Ing.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-02-16 11:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-02-16 at 11:30 AM.
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-26-16 8:30AM in House conference room 309. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-10-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and passed first reading.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor