+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to HHS/JUD, referral sheet 16
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 1
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 1
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor