+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 9).
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cachola, McKelvey, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Awana, Carroll, Fale, Hanohano, Har, Jordan, Oshiro, Takayama, Tokioka voting no (9) and Representative(s) McDermott, Takai, Thielen, Woodson excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Awana, Evans, Fale, Hanohano, Har, Jordan, McKelvey, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 24-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Ito, Kawakami, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Har, C. Lee, Nakashima, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 01-24-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor