+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act 209, 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1310).
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- Act 209, on 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1310).
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680).
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699).
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 43).
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 43) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 at 3:45PM in Conference Room 325.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Slom.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, DeCoite, C. Lee; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-28-15 2:15PM in conference room 325.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 2:05PM in conference room 325.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641).
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Espero, Ihara, Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, DeCoite Co-Chairs; C. Lee, McDermott.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616).
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 634) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1469) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-08-15 9:15AM in conference room 016.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 332).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 809) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 561) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kawakami.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-17-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor