+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-17 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 358).
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) McDermott voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1051), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-28-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 693) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-14-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor