+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 229.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 2:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 2:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 2:15PM in conference room 229.
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-13 2:15PM in conference room 229.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 2:15PM in conference room 229.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697).
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Gabbard, Keith-Agaran, Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Belatti, Nakashima, McKelvey, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Onishi, Woodson, Fukumoto.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 591) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1369) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:15AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 987) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-13 2:00PM in conference room 229.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 371).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Carroll, Cheape, Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Ing, Johanson, Kawakami, Takai, Woodson, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Lowen, Morikawa voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 863), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Lowen, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-13 11:00AM in conference room 308.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-13 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fukumoto, Ing, Woodson voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 560) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Carroll, Evans, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Har, Ito, C. Lee, Yamane.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-13.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-11-13 3:30PM in House conference room 325.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Ing, Kawakami, Morikawa, Woodson voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).
- Reported from HLT/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 237) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Jordan, Kobayashi, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Woodson; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/LAB on Wednesday, 02-06-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HLT/LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor