+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDT/CPN, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 330).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Jordan, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 787), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-05-15 10:30AM in House conference room 308.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 547) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Yamane, McDermott.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-18-15 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takumi excused (1).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 199) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-10-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor