+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on PBS/OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS/OMH on Thursday, 02-12-15 8:45AM in House conference room 309.
- Re-referred to PBS/OMH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 8
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading