+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Rhoads, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Kawakami, McDermott.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 392).
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 409) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Slom, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House.
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-16.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3306) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele.
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-16 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 63).
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 767-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, McDermott, Ohno, Souki, Woodson excused (6).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, McDermott.
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-21-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee excused (1).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 164) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-10-15 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet {refsheetno}
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor