+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 707).
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Nishihara, Baker, Tokuda Co-Chairs; L. Thielen.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Takumi, Luke Co-Chairs; Tokioka, McDermott.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 658) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17.
- Reported from CPH/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1550) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH/WAM deferred the measure until 04-04-17 9:25AM in conference room 211.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM.
- Reported from ETT/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1154) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/WAM.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-17 2:45PM in conference room 414.
- The committee(s) on ETT/PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-20-17 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-17 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to ETT/PSM, CPH/WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 355).
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Ing, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Matsumoto, Nakamura, Onishi, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) C. Lee, Quinlan, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1082) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Choy, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Tupola.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ing, Keohokalole, C. Lee, LoPresti, Lowen, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Quinlan, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 590) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ichiyama, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-17.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-14-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) C. Lee, LoPresti, Matsumoto, Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
- Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 180) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 429.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to TOU, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor