+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-17-15 11:30AM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-15.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-12-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor