+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1).
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Recommitted to Conference committee as amended in CD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Conference Committee.
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, K. Kahele, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads.
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 3:35PM in Conference Room 423.
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Yamane, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 194) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 194).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 1:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 1:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 1:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-24-17 1:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-20-17 1:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; K. Rhoads, K. Kahele Co-Chairs; Kidani.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Yamane, Tokioka Co-Chairs; Ward.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 584).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) English, Espero, Wakai). Transmitted to House.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 538) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-07-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1353) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from ETT/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1150) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim.
- The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Baker.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-17 2:45PM in conference room 414.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to ETT/WTL, WAM.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 198).
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Thielen voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 942), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Lowen, Quinlan; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Tupola.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Quinlan voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from TOU/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 614) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Ichiyama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Evans; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Fukumoto.
- The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Tokioka, Choy, Ito, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Woodson, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU/WAL on Tuesday, 02-14-17 9:30AM in House conference room Auditorium.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to TOU/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 9
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to TOU, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor