+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 306).
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1151), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 603) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill re-scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-13-19 11:15AM in conference room 325.
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-13-19 11:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor