+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN/JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 369).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cheape, Cullen, Fukumoto, Johanson, Oshiro, Takayama, Ward, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Ito, Jordan, Kawakami, Say, Tokioka, Tsuji, Yamashita voting no (13) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 922) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-13 11:00AM in conference room 308.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-13 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
- Reported from LAB/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 480) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Cachola, Carroll, Har, Ito.
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamane, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB/CPC on Wednesday, 02-06-13 4:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to LAB/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 11
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor