+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to WLA, WAM.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AGL/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1081) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Wakai.
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Ihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Shimabukuro.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-15 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGL/WTL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 324).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 833), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-05-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Souki excused (2).
- Reported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 366) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to EEP/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 14
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Tuesday, 02-10-15 11:00AM in House conference room 325.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EEP/WAL, AGR, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading