+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 5:20PM in conference room 225.
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 5-01-15 4:40pm in conference room 016.
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 2:30PM in conference room 016.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 10:20AM in conference room 016.
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 at 4:00 pm in conference room 016.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 9:15AM in conference room 016.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-28-15 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Woodson, McDermott.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617).
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Kouchi, Taniguchi, Wakai.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641).
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616).
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 511) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1553) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Slom.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-09-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1061) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Nishihara, Slom.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-15 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 148).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Oshiro, Pouha, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Kobayashi, Ohno, Onishi, Rhoads, Thielen, Tupola voting no (7) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 888), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Johanson, Lowen, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, DeCoite, Jordan, Keohokalole, Onishi, Tokioka, Pouha, Ward; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kobayashi; and Excused: none.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 485) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-18-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-18-15.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-11-15 2:30PM in House conference room 325.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.