+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-01-17 1:05PM in conference room 308.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Wednesday, 03-01-17.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 683) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Oshiro, McDermott.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 212) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in conference room 423.
- The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-17.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-03-17 10:30AM in House conference room 423.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor