+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Har, Say excused (3).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 368) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Carroll, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-08-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 7
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor