+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On July 11, 2017 in the House:
- Act 120, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1221).
On July 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act 120, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1221).
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 113) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 113).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, K. Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, LoPresti, DeCoite, Gates, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday, 04-25-17 at 1:00PM in Conference Room 312.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-17 11:00AM in conference room 312.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Dela Cruz, K. Kahele.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, LoPresti Co-Chairs; DeCoite, Gates, Thielen.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 545).
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 512) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English). Transmitted to House.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-17.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1291) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 351).
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1026) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Tupola.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 255) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, LoPresti, Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-09-17 10:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.