+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from LCA/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1506) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
- The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 3:35PM in conference room 225.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to LCA/GVO, WAM.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to LCA, WAM.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 122).
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 909), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
On February 16, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Deferred one day 02-13-19.
- Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 281) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Belatti, Morikawa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:00PM in House conference room 312.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor