+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-10-15 8:45AM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-15 at 8:45 am.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-06-15 8:40AM in House conference room 329.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor