+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-11-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-13.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-06-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 7
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor