+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 158) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Johanson, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-03-17 9:15AM in House conference room 309.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor