+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 780) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-06-19 9:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.