+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 19
- Recommitted to HLT as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Nakamura excused.
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 248) as amended in HD 1, recommending recommittal to HLT for further consideration.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Say.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-05-19 11:30AM in conference room 329.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, referral sheet 2
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor