+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-13 11:30AM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-05-13 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 9
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EEP/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor