+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-13 8:30AM in conference room 312.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-13.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-05-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor