+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 180).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 885) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 17, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-13 3:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Say excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 152), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Wooley.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 01-31-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-31-13.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 01-25-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor