+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1).
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 10:05AM in conference room 224.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 10:05AM in conference room 224.
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-24-17 10:05AM in conference room 224.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 10:05AM in conference room 224.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Ruderman.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Creagan, DeCoite Co-Chairs; Evans, LoPresti, Thielen.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 584).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 537) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) English, Espero, Wakai). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-07-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1345) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 1:40PM in conference room 211.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 941) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-17 1:15PM in conference room 224.
- Referred to AEN, WAM.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 192).
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 857), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-17 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 335) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-10-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.