+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Saiki, Yamashita excused (3).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 164-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-04-20 10:30AM in House conference room 329. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov.
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 19
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Recommitted to HLT as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused.
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 41) as amended in HD 1, recommending recommittal to HLT for further consideration.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 01-31-19 11:25AM in conference room 329.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, referral sheet 2
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor