+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to HHS, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to HUS, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 9
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, WAL, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor