+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 1:45PM in conference room 229.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 12:45PM in conference room 229.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 4:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 4:00PM in conference room 229.
- Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator(s) Kouchi discharged as conferee(s); Added as Co-Chair(s).
- Senator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 4:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
- Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Green, Kouchi, Slom.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Carroll, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Cabanilla, Johanson.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417).
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 433) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-03-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1122) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, L. Thielen.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 882) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom.
On March 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-11-13 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-09-13 3:00PM in conference room 229.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, WAM.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 133).
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 683), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Jordan voting no (1) and Representative(s) Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 523), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Jordan.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-14-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor