+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 381) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1).
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 6, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Thursday, 02-09-23 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor