+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 05-01-15 at 5:45PM in Conference Room 312.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 05-01-15 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 312.
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 3:00PM in conference room 312.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 1:05PM in conference room 423.
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-29-15 2:00PM in conference room 312.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Ito, Lowen Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Pouha.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; Galuteria Co-Chair; Inouye, Kahele, Slom.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641).
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 436).
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 489) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Galuteria). Transmitted to House.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1334) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-15 1:30PM in conference room 211.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 942) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-15 1:20PM in conference room 224.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 129).
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 727), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-25-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 328), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Brower, Choy, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Matsumoto.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Monday, 02-09-15 9:05AM in House conference room 312.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading