+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to HHS, WAM.
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 222).
- Passed First Reading.
On March 3, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 964), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 24, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garrett.
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-23 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 421) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1).
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 3, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Tuesday, 02-07-23 8:45AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor