+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 24
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with Representative(s) Evans, Hanohano, Hashem, Jordan, Morikawa voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cheape, Fale, Fukumoto, Johanson, Thielen, Ward voting no (6) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 216) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-05-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor