+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to EGH, WAM.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 132).
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 649), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kobayashi; and Excused: none.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 285), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Choy, Takayama, Tsuji, Cheape, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ohno; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Tokioka.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-07-13 9:15AM in House conference room 312.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor