+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 10:00AM in conference room 309.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-27-15 2:30PM in conference room 309.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Cachola Chair; Nishimoto, Pouha.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Espero, Kouchi, Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641).
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616).
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 622) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1540) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-06-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1144) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-15 9:25AM in conference room 016.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 312).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Jordan, McKelvey, Morikawa, Onishi, Oshiro, Rhoads, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamane, Yamashita voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cullen, Fukumoto Chang, Ing, Kawakami, Kobayashi, Lowen, Matsumoto, Tupola voting no (8) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Cullen, DeCoite, Har, Jordan, Kawakami, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Onishi, Oshiro, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kobayashi voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 635), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Johanson, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, DeCoite, Jordan, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kobayashi; and Excused: none.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading