+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
- Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 257) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ichiyama.
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Bill re-scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-21 11:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
- The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-21 at 9:45AM.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 02-05-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor