+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On July 11, 2017 in the House:
- Act 130, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1231).
On July 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act 130, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1231).
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 12:31PM in conference room 224.
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 2:16PM in conference room 224.
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 4:31PM in conference room 224.
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, LoPresti, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 143) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 143).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 11:05AM in conference room 224.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 11:05AM in conference room 224.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 11:05AM in conference room 224.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 11:05AM in conference room 224.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Baker, Riviere Co-Chairs.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Lowen Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Tupola.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 649) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1577) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee on WAM has added the measure to decision making scheduled on 04-04-17 9:35AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AEN/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 970) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Espero, Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang.
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-17 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN/CPH, WAM.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 190).
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 922), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Tupola.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 517) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Kong, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-14-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor