+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-12-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 469).
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1277) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-19 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 765) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Brower.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:10PM in House conference room 325.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor