+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 357).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 800) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi.
On February 17, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
- Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 511) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Brower, Carroll, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Belatti, Cabanilla, Ito, Wooley, Thielen.
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Carroll, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Cachola, Har, Ito, Thielen.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Monday, 02-11-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor