+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN/EDU.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 65).
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 753), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-23-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 639), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-15-17 8:40AM in House conference room 312.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.