+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680).
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699).
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Cullen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Brower, Johanson, Kobayashi, Kong, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Ohno, San Buenaventura, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (12) and none excused (0).
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 21 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara, Shimabukuro . 4 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere, Slom, L. Thielen, Wakai. 0 Excused: none.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Tokuda, Harimoto, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Aquino, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 at 3:45PM in Conference Room 309.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 166) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 166).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 1:45PM in conference room 309.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 1:45PM in conference room 309.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-27-15 3:00PM in conference room 309.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653).
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 2:00PM in conference room 309.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Espero, Tokuda Co-Chairs; Harimoto, Kouchi.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Aquino, Onishi, McDermott.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616).
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 508) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, Wakai . Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Riviere, Slom, L. Thielen). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1560) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere, Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-07-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TRA/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1099) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, Dela Cruz, Espero, Inouye, Kidani, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Keith-Agaran ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRA/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-15 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 146).
- Referred to TRA/PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Ichiyama, Jordan, Keohokalole, Matsumoto, Oshiro, Pouha, San Buenaventura, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Brower, Johanson, Kobayashi, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Ohno, Thielen, Tupola, Ward, Yamashita voting no (11) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Cachola, Creagan, Cullen, Fukumoto Chang, Jordan, Keohokalole, Matsumoto, McDermott, Ohno, Oshiro, Pouha, Tokioka, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Brower, Johanson, Kobayashi, C. Lee, Lowen, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (8) and Representative(s) Belatti, Nishimoto excused (2).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 636) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Cullen, Jordan, Keohokalole, Tokioka, Pouha; 7 Noes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, DeCoite, Johanson, Kobayashi, Lowen, Yamashita, Ward; and Excused: none.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-15 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor