+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-14-18 2:10PM in House conference room 309.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Souki excused (3).
- Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 87-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Tuesday, 01-30-18 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to HHS, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Wednesday, 02-01-17 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor