+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TSI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 953) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TSI recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TSI were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Taniguchi, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Slom.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TSI has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-15 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to TSI, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 307).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Rhoads voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 882), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Kobayashi; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Souki excused (2).
- Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 386) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Ohno, Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Ito.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Wednesday, 02-11-15 9:30AM in House conference room 312.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor