+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to WTL/HWN.
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/THA.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 354).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5).
- Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 745) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee.
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-15-13 10:35AM in conference room 325.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL/OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-13 at 8:35am.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Wednesday, 02-13-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to WAL/OMH, referral sheet 17
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, OMH, referral sheet 7
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading